Case Information: 51708 | |||
Short Caption: | ARDOIN (PHILLIP) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45783 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192803 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Cherry | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/23/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
05/23/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/23/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-13001 | |
06/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-14485 | |
06/09/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/27/07, 5/22/07, 4/8/08, 4/29/08. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. | 08-14487 | |
06/20/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant; Fast Track Statement due: August 1, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-15878 | |
06/26/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Janie Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/27/07, 5/22/07, 4/08/08, and 4/29/08. | 08-16443 | |
07/31/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Second) Request for Enlargement of Time to File Fast Track Statement. | 08-19896 | |
08/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: August 29, 2008. | 08-20283 | |
09/02/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-22431 | |
09/02/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols 1-3. | 08-22434 | |
09/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-24593 | |
09/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Fast track response due: October 22, 2008. | 08-24931 | |
10/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 11 pages. Fast Track Response. | 08-27348 | |
10/24/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-27349 | |
07/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the amended judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-18047 | |
08/18/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-18457 | |
08/18/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/01/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 2009. | 09-18457 |