judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WIIDEMAN (RANDAL) VS. WARDEN C/W 33879

Case Information: 36319
Short Caption:WIIDEMAN (RANDAL) VS. WARDEN C/W 33879Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 33879 *, 36319
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 99282Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/06/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/20/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10562
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-13535
10/06/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 00-17773
10/06/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn19[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 33879/36319. 01-09903
07/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10410
07/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2001. 01-10410