judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOUGLAS ANTHONY SHORT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0014)
Case Number:S-08-0014Case Docketed On:01/22/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DOUGLAS ANTHONY SHORT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DOUGLAS ANTHONY SHORT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDouglas Anthony ShortDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 52
Citation:205 P.3d 195

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/22/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/26/2008Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
02/26/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion to stay - unopposed.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/05/2008Order - Stay briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
04/04/2008Event - Phone Call. Called Clerk's office and was advised that nothing has been filed in the case since the state's traverse to motion to correct illegal sentence in mid March and no hearing date has been set or order entered.EventPhone CallFinal
05/06/2008Event - Phone Call. Called Clerk's office again. Still no action or setting since the last pleading was filed. Stated we will check again in another month.EventPhone CallFinal
06/09/2008Event - Phone Call. Called the district court clerk, still no action. They show the file checked out to the Public Defender's office. Called Eric Alden for status check. He stated he will send a status check letter to Judge Perry.EventPhone CallFinal
06/27/2008System - Status check - other - Mr. Alden stated that he sent letter to district court judge inquiring about status and sent more documents. He indicated that he told the judge that he could decide on the pleadings, or schedule hearing - either is fine with him.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
07/16/2008System - Status check - other. Contacted clerk of district court regarding status. A hearing is scheduled for August 4, 2008, regarding the motion to correct sentence.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
08/22/2008Correspondence - Incoming. Copy of letter from Judge Perry to Counsel regarding credit for time served and directing counsel to prepare corrective order.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/24/2008Event - Other - counsel for appellant verbally advised Court that order had been entered; told him to put that in motion to resume briefing scheduleEventOtherFinal
09/30/2008Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - received copy of corrected sentencing order from counsel for appellant. Requested briefing schedule be resumed.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
10/01/2008Order - Lifting Stay and setting briefing scheduleOrderLifting StayFinal
11/17/2008Correspondence - Incoming from Counsel for Appellant re record. Counsel will attach pleadings from detention and extradition from Colorado to brief and try and get included in transmitted recordCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/17/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/19/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and a copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/13/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/11/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric M. Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny L. Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/13/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/04/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/1/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal