Case Information: 53446 | |||
Short Caption: | QUAGLIANA VS. GRIGORIEV | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A514592 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/20/2009 / Tanksley, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lewis & Roca check no. 405870. | ||
03/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-06983 | |
03/20/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley | 09-07193 | |
04/07/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-08693 | |
04/10/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 09-09024 | |
05/04/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 09-10952 | |
08/14/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. The premediation conference has not been conducted because this case appears to be settling according to prior calls with attorneys and settlement status check scheduled in district court for 9/10/09. | 09-19818 | |
10/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 15 days. | 09-24650 | |
10/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 09-26112 | |
10/28/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 09-26473 | |
10/28/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |