Case Information: 53480 | |||
Short Caption: | VECE VS. TAVITIAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A522266 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/30/2009 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/26/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/26/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-07650 | |
03/26/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-07652 | |
03/30/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell | 09-07965 | |
03/31/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ralph A. Schwartz - check no. 2275. | ||
04/07/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 3/26/09 addressed to Freeman Mondragon Law Firm. Updated address per NOA filed 3/26/09. Remailed Rec for Docs to updated address. | 09-08745 | |
04/24/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 09-10288 | |
05/05/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-11095 | |
05/06/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/19/09 | 09-11263 | |
05/21/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 7/7/09 | 09-12698 | |
10/12/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 09-24848 | |
11/02/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests that this case remain in the settlement program until 11/30/09 due to change of supervising legal personnel. | 09-26690 | |
11/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Settlement Judge request for extension approved. Final Status Report due 11/30/09 | 09-27267 | |
12/10/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 09-29989 | |
12/11/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. The stipulation to dismiss will be filed after the formal document has been executed. | 09-30152 | |
12/17/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 09-30685 | |
12/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 09-30935 | |
03/31/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. The settlement judge reported the parties had agreed to a settlement. Appellant has not responded to our order directing her to file a stipulationor motion to dismiss. Accordingly, cause appearing "we dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-08425 | |
04/26/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-08601 | |
04/26/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/04/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 29, 2010. | 10-08601 |