judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HIGUERA (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51493
Short Caption:HIGUERA (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 57238 , 59514 , 66058
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C233947Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/19/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/25/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/25/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-10323
05/15/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-12254
05/15/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/18/07, 8/13/07, 9/05/07, 2/06/08, 2/14/08, and 3/26/08. To Court Reporters: Julie Lever/Angela Lee/Renee Vincent. 08-12255
06/03/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angela Lee stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/13/07, 9/5/07, 2/6/08. 08-14021
06/18/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/14/08 and 3/26/08. 08-15654
07/10/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Julie Lever to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. 7/18/07. Due date: 10 days. 08-17579
07/23/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Lever stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: None listed. 08-19010
08/25/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-21860
08/25/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 2. 08-21861
09/25/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-24882
09/29/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Service for Answering Brief. 08-25122
11/06/2008Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief filed.
11/19/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 08-29464
11/19/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/03/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Fn1 [. . . We direct the district court to remove the language "as set forth in the jury's verdict" from the judgment of conviction.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP. 09-02989
03/03/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-04639
03/03/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/16/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 2009. 09-04639