Case Information: 51482 | |||
Short Caption: | GARCIA (ALBERT) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 07EW01389 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/23/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/23/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-10167 | |
05/15/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12293 | |
06/10/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13097 | |
06/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 11, 2008. | 08-13097 |