Case Information: 51490 | |||
Short Caption: | JONES (ANTWON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 63609 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C235771 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/22/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-10311 | |
05/08/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11515 | |
05/08/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/27/07, 02/19/08, 03/06/08, and 03/25/08. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard, Cheryl Gardner, and Kim Tuchman. | 08-11541 | |
06/11/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 08-14770 | |
06/20/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended. | 08-15888 | |
06/24/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Letter w/attachments (Affidavit and District Court minutes) regarding transcript request to court reporter Cheryl Gardner. | 08-16075 | |
06/24/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended (second). Transcripts requested: 12/27/07, 2/19/08, 3/25/08. To Court Reporters: Sharon Howard, Kim Tuchman. | 08-16076 | |
06/25/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: December 27, 2007 and February 19, 2008. | 08-16242 | |
06/25/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: December 27, 2007 and February 19, 2008. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. | 08-16245 | |
06/30/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Kim Tuchman to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. Amended (second). 3/25/08. | 08-16555 | |
07/10/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Tuchman stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/25/08. | 08-17682 | |
07/10/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 3/25/08. Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. | 08-17683 | |
08/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Transmit Pre-Sentence Investigation Report for Court's Consideration. | 08-21572 | |
08/21/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-21573 | |
08/21/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-21574 | |
09/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. District Court Clerk: Transmit pre-sentence report: due 20 days. | 08-23427 | |
09/30/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Answering Brief. | 08-25290 | |
10/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-26448 | |
10/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 08-26449 | |
12/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No Repy Brief filed. | ||
12/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 08-32336 | |
12/22/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/06/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court with instructions to vacate the sentence for the deadly weapon enhancment attendant to Jones's sentence for consipiracy." SNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-11252 | |
06/02/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12797 | |
06/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/10/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2009. | 09-12797 |