Case Information: 51489 | |||
Short Caption: | GRANT (AUBREY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 42407 , 42869 , 42933 , 49012 , 62376 , 64431 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192433 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-10306 | |
06/09/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-14507 | |
07/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-15426 | |
07/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 11, 2008. | 08-15426 |