Case Information: 53468 | |||
Short Caption: | BLACKMAN, JR. (KELVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C243596 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-07451 | |
03/24/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/24/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07452 | |
03/27/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. | 09-07696 | |
03/31/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-08059 | |
04/01/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/13/09 and 03/10/09. | 09-08163 | |
05/12/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Due date: 10 days. | 09-11721 | |
05/22/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 09-12892 | |
05/27/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. Part 1. Note: pages 51-94 are missing. Appellant was notified and will submit them as a supplement to the appendix. | 09-13202 | |
05/27/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. Part 2. | 09-13204 | |
06/11/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 09-14621 | |
06/12/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Supplement. Pages 51-94. (submitted 5/27/09) | 09-14739 | |
06/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We decline to grant appellant permission to file documents in proper person. Nevertheless, the clerk of this court shall file the proper person motion received on June 8, 2010. We deny removal of counsel. | 10-15251 | |
06/11/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Expand the Information Before the Court. | 10-14660 | |
11/18/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We decline to grant appellant permission to file documents in this appeal in proper person motion. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proper person motion received on November 12, 2010. | 10-30162 | |
10/05/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Filing of Supplemental Appendix. Appellant: Supplemental Appendix due: 14 days. | 11-30356 | |
10/27/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the necessary (supplemental) appendix. | 11-33172 | |
11/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5 (missing pages 51-94 from previous filing on 5/27/11). | 11-34159 | |
11/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. | 11-34161 | |
12/07/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of conviction REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 11-37447 | |
01/03/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-00096 | |
01/03/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
01/13/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 10, 2012. | 12-00096 |