judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (WALTER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31554
Short Caption:SMITH (WALTER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR972255Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/18/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/16/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
12/16/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to all counsel).
12/18/1997TranscriptFiled Transcript. Of proceedings: November 13, 1997, Sentencing. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn.
01/07/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.
01/07/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix.
01/07/1998MotionFiled Motion. Requesting the Court to direct the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to forward the Presentence Investigation Report.
01/15/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The clerk of the district court is directed to forward a certified copy of the presentence report, in a sealed envelope, for inclusion in the appendix and consideration by this court.
01/21/1998Other Other. Received Certified Copy of Probation Report-SEALED.
01/28/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
03/12/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the dispositon of this appeal. The appellant shall file and serve the opening brief within 40 days after the date of this order. 1[We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal]. 2[Oral argument will not be scheduled, and this appeal shall stand submitted on the record and briefs filed herein, upon completion of briefing].
04/22/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including May 21, 1998, to file the opening brief.
05/21/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 5/20/98.)
05/22/1998Other Other. Filed Certificate of Compliance.
06/11/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 6/10/98.)
06/18/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 6/17/98.)
06/18/1998Other Other. Case submitted on briefs this day.
06/18/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-14513
09/13/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14700
09/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2000. 00-14700