judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CALVIN D. BATES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1166
Short Caption:CALVIN D. BATES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Lead: 10-CM-1165 Consolidated:10-CM-1166
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD8064-10Filed Date:09/14/2010

Opening Event Date:09/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/18/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCalvin D. Bates Y
Jeffrey L. LightNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/28/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CM-1165 and 10-CM-1166 for all purposes herein. Itis FURTHER ORDERED that Jeffrey Light, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in these appeals. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript avaiable for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the records on appeals. (By: JAC)
09/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jeffrey Light, Esquire
10/06/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
11/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (135pgs/Tape) 8/9/10 proc.
11/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (8pgs/Tape) 9/10/10 proc. w/CD included
11/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/04/2010RECORD INDEX (10CM1166)
11/04/2010RECORD COPIES (10CM1166)
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (Pretrial Services report filed 5/8/10; request for revocation/ removal from PSA supervision filed 7/1/10) *******SEALED
11/04/2010RECORD INDEX (10CM1165)
11/04/2010RECORD COPIES (10CM1165)
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (Pretrial Services report filed 5/8/10; request for revocation/ removal from PSA supervision filed 7/1/1/0) ******SEALED
11/09/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/16/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/14/11 no oppo
12/28/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 14, 2011. (JAC)
02/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF appendix attached
02/14/2011APPENDIX
03/17/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 20, 2011 (no oppo)
03/30/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 28, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo).
05/12/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 31, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
05/26/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/26/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/12/2011FiledMotion for Oral Argument (Appellant)
10/18/2011FiledArgued BeforeFisher,Reid,Farrell Jeffrey L.Light Esq.,for appellant Sharon A.Sprague Esq.,for appellee
10/28/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, retired, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
11/07/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc
02/14/2012FiledMandate