judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ERIC DEMILLARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0290)
Case Number:S-07-0290Case Docketed On:12/19/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:ERIC DEMILLARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ERIC DEMILLARD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEric Levanter DeMillardDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Brian J. Hunter
Jonah Buckley
Eric Alan Johnson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 93
Citation:190 P.3d 123 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/20/2007Event - Phone Call from court reporter; appellant filed certification that transcripts were requested, but did not request court reporter transcribe. Hearing transcript complete now and will be forwarded to district court clerk.EventPhone CallFinal
02/05/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Brian J. Hunter and Jonah Buckley, Student Interns, for appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
03/17/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received consent and approvalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee and designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/11/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eleven volumes. Volumes I-VIII, original papers; Volume IV, misc. paperwork; volume X, confidential folder; Volume XI, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jonah Buckley for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/14/2008Correspondence - Incoming. Received copy of letter from the Defendant to the Attorney General's Office - no action taken.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Eric Johnson, Director, PAP, and Jonah Buckley, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Buckley for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal