Case Information: 51485 | |||
Short Caption: | PODOVICH VS. AARGON AGENCY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A520591 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/29/2008 / Hammer, Bill | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/24/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ghanem & Sullivan LLP check no. 3817. | ||
04/24/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-10259 | |
04/29/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Bill C. Hammer. | 08-10687 | |
05/13/2008 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Docketing Statement not typewritten. Corrected Docketing Statement due 10 days. | 08-11889 | |
05/27/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-13240 | |
06/26/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled in middle to late July. | 08-16386 | |
09/16/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: Late September or early October. | 08-23899 | |
11/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 08-28016 | |
11/03/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. A Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal has been filed. | 08-28049 | |
11/10/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- PANEL-TH | 08-28615 | |
11/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |