judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADAMS VS. QUILICI

Case Information: 53477
Short Caption:ADAMS VS. QUILICICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 33826Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/30/2009 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/11/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/26/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Pederson & Kalter - check no. 2871.
03/26/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-07617
03/30/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell 09-07962
04/10/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-09033
04/13/2009Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 09-09257
05/12/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/17/09 09-11704
07/22/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 8/6/09 09-17909
10/12/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Final Settlement Report. 09-24847
10/19/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 09-25484
10/23/2009Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 09-26011
11/02/2009Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 09-26702
11/02/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order Reinstating Briefing. 09-26703
01/21/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-01772
01/21/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 10-01773
01/22/2010Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. -Letter explaining efile mishap, original being mailed. 10-01813
01/25/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Complete copy of Appellant's Appendix. 10-02011
02/19/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Leona Quilici's Answering Brief 10-04563
04/21/2010Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
05/11/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 10-12170
05/11/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/25/2010Order/DispositionalOrder of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 10-27848
11/19/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-30276
11/19/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/24/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2010. 10-30276