Case Information: 53478 | |||
Short Caption: | MID VALLEY ENTERPRISES VS. TON C/W 52860 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 52860 *, 53478 | Related Case(s): | 52860 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A539815 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/27/2009 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/03/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/26/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Brownstein firm - check no. 40048. | ||
03/26/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-07643 | |
03/26/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days. | 09-07646 | |
03/27/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost | 09-07679 | |
04/06/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-08535 | |
04/07/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 09-08680 | |
04/13/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/8/09 | 09-09291 | |
04/13/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-09292 | |
06/30/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. and Consolidating Appeals. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Ton & Mid Valley: 15 days to request transcripts; Ton: 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Mid Valley: 30 days from opening brief to file combined answering brief in 52860 and opening brief in 53478. Ton: 30 days from Mid Valley's combined brief to file combined reply brief in 52860 and answering brief in 53478. Mid Valley: 30 days from service of Ton's combined brief to file reply brief in 53478. 52860/53478 | ||
09/25/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Nos. 52860/53478. (09-23510) | ||
09/25/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume A. Nos. 52860/53478. (09-23522) | ||
09/25/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume B. Nos. 52860/53478. (09-23533) | ||
10/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: Brief due: November 30, 2009. Nos. 52860/53478 (09-26089). (Respondent Mid Valley Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief). | ||
11/30/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Mid Valley Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief. Nos. 52860/53478 (09-28990). | ||
12/01/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent/Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. Nos. 52860/53478 (09-29031). | ||
12/29/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant/Respondents Combined Reply/Answering Brief. Nos. 52860/53478. (09-31946) | ||
01/28/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 52860/53478 (10-02518). | ||
01/28/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Certificate of Compliance to Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief due: 10 days. Nos. 52860/53478 (10-02519). | ||
02/02/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Compliance. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief filed on 01/28/10. Nos. 52860/53478 (10-02791). | ||
03/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in these consolidated appeals, and they shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. Nos. 52860/53478 (10-05563). | ||
03/03/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Nos. 52860/53478. | ||
05/12/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. 'We affirm the district court's post-judgment order denying Mid Valley Enterprises, LLC's motion for attorney fees in Docket No. 53478. We affirm in part and reverse in part the district court's summary judgment, and we remand this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. In light of this conclusion, we disagree with Sheri's Ranch that Ton's lawsuit was frivolous, and therefore we affirm the district court's order denying attorney fees in Docket No. 53478.' SNP10-JH/MD/KP. Nos. 52860/53478. | 10-12315 | |
06/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-12958 | |
06/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 11, 2010. | 10-12958 |