Case Information: 51488 | |||
Short Caption: | PALOVICH (JOSEPH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34533 , 72150 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C067074 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-10301 | |
05/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant: 15 days to show cause. | 08-11382 | |
05/22/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. | 08-12864 | |
05/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause Filed May 7, 2008. | 08-13090 | |
06/02/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-13845 | |
06/10/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED."[Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-14746 | |
07/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-15462 | |
07/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 11, 2008. | 08-15462 |