judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PENA (ERASMO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53470
Short Caption:PENA (ERASMO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44432
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C188684 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:CherryCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/16/2010 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/16/2010How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/24/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 09-07463
03/24/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/24/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 09-07466
03/24/2009OtherDisqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings.
04/16/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/19/09. 09-09544
04/24/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Case Appeal Statement, Transcript Request Form, and Docketing Statement. District Court Clerk: 15 days to transmit case appeal statement. Appellant: 15 days to file transcript request form and docketing statement. 09-10196
05/01/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 09-10905
05/06/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/12/06. Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. Filed in district court on: 4/03/09. 09-11279
05/06/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/17/07, 10/23/08, and 10/27/08 - 11/07/08. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: 04/03/09. 09-11282
05/06/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/19/09. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. Filed in district court on: 4/03/09. 09-11283
05/13/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-11872
06/11/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/17/07, 10/28/08, 10/29/08, 10/30/08, 11/3/08 through 11/7/08. 09-14546
07/29/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Appellant Pena 09-18581
08/07/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (32) days. 09-19274
08/10/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension. Opening brief due September 14, 2009. 09-19452
09/15/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60) days. 09-22350
09/17/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file the opening brief. Due: 11/13/09. 09-22539
11/10/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (32) days. 09-27462
11/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 14, 2009. 09-27743
12/15/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-30473
12/21/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 13, 2010. 09-30810
01/19/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-01515
01/19/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 8. 10-01516
02/18/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (45 days). 10-04449
02/19/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 5, 2010. 10-04546
04/05/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-08801
05/06/2010MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 4, 2010. 10-11763
06/04/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-14373
06/07/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: July 6, 2010. 10-14528
07/08/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-17661
07/09/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: July 13, 2010. 10-17715
07/15/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 10-18108
11/03/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 16, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas before the Southern Nevada Panel. 10-28813
12/03/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 10-31373
12/16/2010Case Status UpdateOral Argument Held this Day. Case Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel.
02/04/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." 11-03601
02/22/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 11-05453
03/30/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). 11-09600
04/25/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-12123
04/25/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 29, 2011. 11-12123
01/24/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Erasmo Pena Moreno returning, unfiled, the letter received on 1/23/12. 12-02498