judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOPER (JUSTIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53469
Short Caption:LOPER (JUSTIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 52246 , 52636 , 52637 , 52991 , 55779
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C238809 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/01/2009How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/24/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-07454
03/24/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/30/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 09-07991
04/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Supplemental record on appeal due: 30 days. 09-08575
04/27/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on April 22, 2009. 09-10403
05/01/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 3. (Supplemental) 09-10907
05/01/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/08/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 09-11493
01/26/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. 10-02174
02/03/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Labeled Vols. 4 and 5. (Replacement for volumes 1 and 2 originally ordered to be transferred from Docket No. 52637). 10-03015
02/24/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Supplemental Record due: 40 days. 10-04866
03/15/2010TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/3/07. Court Reporter: K. Schmidt. 10-06838
03/15/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/3/07. 10-06839
04/02/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/09/08. 10-08691
04/14/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Record on Appeal. Upon issuance of the remittitur in Docket No. 53469, this court directs the clerk of this court to transfer the record on appeal previously filed in Docket No. 53469 to Docket No. 55779. Supplemental Record in Docket No. 55779 due: 30 days. Nos. 53469/55779. 10-09728
04/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 6. 10-09881
06/10/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG fn3[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 10-14944
07/08/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-16187
07/08/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/21/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2010. 10-16187