Case Information: 53439 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHNSON VS.DIST. CT. (NEV. DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CV0812156 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/18/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Certiorari. | 09-06908 | |
04/09/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-08915 | |
05/05/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-09648 | |
05/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/20/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on July 2, 2009 and placed on the docket July 14, 2009 as Case No. 09-5285. | 09-17766 | |
11/05/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | 09-27092 |