Case Information: 51492 | |||
Short Caption: | WYTCHERLEY (KEVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C224388 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/07/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-10318 | |
05/15/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12222 | |
07/07/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-17184 | |
07/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/26/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-07575 | |
04/21/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-08277 | |
04/21/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/30/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 24, 2009. | 09-08277 |