Case Information: 51491 | |||
Short Caption: | RICHARDSON VS. DIST. CT. (HECHT) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A480252 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Patti, Sgro & Lewis--check no. 8661. | ||
04/25/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Emergency Petition for a Writ of Prohibition and Mandamus pursuant to NRS 34.170, NRS 48.015, NRAP 21, NRCP 60(b) and NRCP 16.1. | 08-10316 | |
04/25/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 08-10320 | |
04/28/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. For Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP08-JH/RP/MC | 08-10541 | |
04/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Emergency Motion to Stay Cause. (filed via fax) | 08-10583 | |
04/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion for Stay as Moot. As the petition has been denied, we deny as moot petitioner's motion for a stay. | 08-10747 | |
05/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Emergency Motion and Order to Stay Cause (filed by fax on 4/28/08). | 08-10988 | |
05/23/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-11742 | |
05/23/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |