Case Information: 53457 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF PHYLLIS BRYAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/20/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2009 | Petition/Bar | Filed Petition/Discipline. Petition for Reciprocal Discipline pursuant to SCR 114. | 09-07187 | |
03/31/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. | 09-08069 | |
03/31/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 3/20/09 addressed to Phyllis J. Bryan at the Beverly Hills, CA address. Per USPS, returned to sender (no box checked). | 09-08069 | |
11/18/2009 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Bar Discipline Order. Order of Referral to Disciplinary Board. "We . . . refer this matter to the appropriate panel of the bar disciplinary board for determination of the appropriate discipline to be imposed." fn3-[This order constitutes our final disposition of this matter. Any further proceedings concerning Bryan shall be docketed as a new matter.] EN BANC | 09-28107 | |
11/30/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 11/18/09 addressed to Phyllis J. Bryan at the Beverly Hills, CA address. Per USPS, returned (no box checked). No forwarding address. | 09-28977 | |
12/15/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-30016 | |
12/15/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/29/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Notice in Lieu of Remittitur 12/15/09 addressed to Phyllis J. Bryan at the Beverly Hills, CA address. Per USPS, returned (no box checked). No forwarding address. | 09-31461 |