Case Information: 53458 | |||
Short Caption: | VAUGHT (ARTHUR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR072960 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/20/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-07196 | |
03/20/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07197 | |
03/27/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/30/08, 11/12/08-11/13/08, and 3/16/09. Court Reporter: Captions Unlimited. Filed in district court on: Not filed in district court. | 09-07766 | |
04/27/2009 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 6, 2009. | 09-10387 | |
05/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-11132 | |
05/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due June 1, 2009. | 09-11798 | |
06/01/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-13641 | |
06/01/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. | 09-13642 | |
06/22/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-15419 | |
06/22/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. Supplemental Joint Appendix. | 09-15420 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-06435 | |
04/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-07073 | |
04/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. | 10-07073 |