Case Information: 53472 | |||
Short Caption: | LARSON (STEVEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR081710 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-07470 | |
03/24/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/26/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07637 | |
04/03/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 3/24/09 addressed to Steven Scott Larson. Address updated per NDOC. Rec for Docs remailed to new address. | 09-08413 | |
04/13/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Federico stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:3/13/09. | 09-09241 | |
05/04/2009 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 11, 2009. | 09-10957 | |
05/12/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Cheryl Bond. | 09-11686 | |
05/12/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to file Fast Track Statement in Excess of Ten Pages. | 09-11699 | |
05/12/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages is approved. 13 pages granted. | 09-11701 | |
05/12/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-11707 | |
05/12/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 09-11709 | |
06/01/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-13601 | |
10/07/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/MD/MG. | 09-24538 | |
11/03/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-26435 | |
11/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/12/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 4, 2009. | 09-26435 |