Case Information: 53473 | |||
Short Caption: | COMSTOCK (STEPHEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44540 , 50699 , 58260 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR032557 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-07471 | |
03/24/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/24/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07472 | |
03/31/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Premature Appeal. | 09-08076 | |
04/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Order and Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 09-09221 | |
05/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 09-12360 | |
05/21/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 12, 2009. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Lw and Judgment. (In response to order filed 4/13/09). | 09-12681 | |
06/01/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Reinstating Briefing. Rough Draft Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 50 days. | 09-13560 | |
06/18/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Rough Draft Transcripts due 5 days. Counsel cautioned. | 09-15249 | |
06/22/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/28/08. To Court Reporter: Molezzo Reporters. | 09-15438 | |
08/05/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Fast track statement and appendix or motion for extension of time due 10 days. | 09-19045 | |
08/05/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-19114 | |
08/05/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Part 1. | 09-19124 | |
08/05/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Part 2. | 09-19126 | |
08/05/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Part 3. | 09-19130 | |
08/19/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-20157 | |
08/19/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 09-20158 | |
10/05/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person motions received on September 25, September 28, and September 30, 2009. We deny appellant's motions to proceed in proper perso on appeal. | 09-24228 | |
10/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. | 09-23543 | |
10/05/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Notice | 09-23619 | |
10/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to File Proper Pleading. | 09-23840 | |
12/02/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP fn1[Because Comstock is represented by counsel in this matter, we decline to grant him permission to file documents in proper person in this court. Accordingly, this court shall take no action on and shall not consider the proper person documents Comstock has submitted to this court in this matter.] | 09-29175 | |
12/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-30296 | |
12/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 30, 2009. | 09-30296 |