judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEARSON (GAREN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53471
Short Caption:PEARSON (GAREN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38098 , 63776
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159932 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Cherry, DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Parraguirre for Justice CherryPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/24/2010How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/24/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 09-07468
03/24/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/24/2009OtherDisqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings.
03/24/2009OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
04/15/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. 09-09520
05/06/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 05/27/08, 5/30/08, and 12/11/08. Court Reporter: B. Nelson and/or L. Bahr. Filed in district court on: 4/03/09. 09-11258
05/13/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-11899
07/29/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Appellant Pearson 09-18574
08/07/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (32) days. 09-19276
08/10/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension. Opening brief due September 14, 2009. 09-19453
09/16/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-22427
09/17/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening Brief and Appendix due October 14, 2009. 09-22547
10/21/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request). (7) days. 09-25674
10/22/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received on October 22, 2009. Answering Brief due: 30 days. 09-25829
10/22/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-25805
10/22/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 09-25806
10/28/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Receipt of Copy - Opening Brief and Appendix. 09-26323
11/19/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-28227
11/19/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: December 23, 2009. 09-28228
12/23/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-31203
12/30/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 09-31504
01/26/2010MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 22, 2010. 10-02179
02/24/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 10-04933
02/24/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/30/2010Order/DispositionalOrder of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 10-25284
10/05/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Disassociation of Counsel and Change of Address. Mark Bailus/Bailus Cook & Kelesis, Ltd. is no longer associated with this case. 10-25718
10/18/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 10-27204
12/08/2010Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 10-31954
01/03/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-00038
01/03/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/21/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 11, 2011. 11-00038