Case Information: 53463 | |||
Short Caption: | POTTS (RANDOLPH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45981 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR050711 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-07432 | |
03/24/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/24/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07433 | |
04/01/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/17/08, 1/14/09. Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. Filed in district court on: 3/30/09. | 09-08210 | |
04/10/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Joan Dotson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/17/08 and 1/14/09. | 09-09059 | |
05/01/2009 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 11, 2009. | 09-10823 | |
05/08/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-11417 | |
05/08/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 09-11418 | |
05/29/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-13352 | |
05/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Supplemental Joint Appendix. | 09-13353 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-06446 | |
04/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-07003 | |
04/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 13, 2010. | 10-07003 |