Case Information: 53455 | |||
Short Caption: | PARKS VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51658 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC0710024 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/25/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/20/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-07180 | |
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-08515 | |
05/05/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Substitution of Attorney for Repondents. | 09-11069 | |
06/25/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-15783 | |
06/25/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/10/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-21928 | |
10/26/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 09-26153 | |
11/20/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-28255 | |
11/20/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 23, 2009. | 09-28255 |