Case Information: 53454 | |||
Short Caption: | KANVICK VS. CITY OF SPARKS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0800957 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/20/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-07170 | |
03/20/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 4/22/08. Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. | 09-07184 | |
05/08/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-11484 | |
06/10/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-14518 | |
07/07/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-16558 | |
07/07/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 8, 2009. | 09-16558 |