Case Information: 53475 | |||
Short Caption: | RAMIREZ (MIGUEL) VS. WHITE PINE COUNTY CLERK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - WM0712004 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/10/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/25/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/25/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-07481 | |
04/08/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-08839 | |
06/15/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 09-14827 | |
07/29/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. fn1An order directing transmission of the record was previously filed on June 15, 2009, but the district court clerk was inadvertently omitted from the list of that order's recipients. This order therefore replaces the June 15, 2009, order, and the time for the district court clerk to transmit the record commences with entry of this order.] | 09-18567 | |
08/10/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-19446 | |
08/10/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/30/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to File Judicial Notice to the Court. | 09-28967 | |
03/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn1[We deny appellant's "motion for leave to file 'judicial notice to the court.'"] SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-06193 | |
04/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-06790 | |
04/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2010. | 10-06790 |