Case Information: 53474 | |||
Short Caption: | CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 53486 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 53474*, 53486 | Related Case(s): | 42125 , 46011 , 46682 , 47886 , 50487 , 54335 , 57745 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030873 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-07473 | |
03/24/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/14/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG Nos. 53474/53486. | 09-09369 | |
05/12/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-10584 | |
05/12/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/20/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 13, 2009. | 09-10584 |