Case Information: 53441 | |||
Short Caption: | GUERRERO (ALBERTO) VS. STATE C/W 53839/53943 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 53441*, 53839 , 53943 | Related Case(s): | 32173 , 32242 , 41023 , 41024 , 53839 , 53943 , 55789 , 55790 , 72581 , 72581-COA , 72582 , 72582-COA |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141455 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/09/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-06926 | |
03/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-08512 | |
06/09/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-11. (TRANSFERRED TO CASE NO. 55789 PER ORDER 5/13/10) | 09-14402 | |
06/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/13/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Re: Record on Appeal and Consolidating Appeals in Docket Nos. 55789 and 55790. This court elects to consolidate the appeals in Docket Nos. 55789 and 55790. Upon issuance of the remittitur in Docket No. 53441, this court directs the clerk of this court to transfer the record on appeal previously filed in Docket No. 53441 to Docket No. 55789. District court: 30 days to file supplemental record on appeal in Docket No. 55789 containing all documents filed in the district court since the record on appeal was filed in this court in Docket No. 53441 or inform this court in writing that no supplemental record on appeal is required. Nos. 53441/55789/55790. | 10-12452 | |
09/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. We eclect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn8[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Nos. 53441/53839/53943. | 10-23322 | |
10/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 53441/53839/53943 | 10-26266 | |
10/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/20/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 15, 2010. Nos. 53441/53839/53943 | 10-26266 |