Case Information: 53440 | |||
Short Caption: | GUARDADO (ERNEST) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49811 , 49874 , 55033 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR022779 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/18/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 09-06925 | |
03/27/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. | 09-07791 | |
04/08/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 09-08759 | |
05/06/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to resolve the July 8, 2004 petition as expeditiously as the district court's calendar permits." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-11225 | |
05/06/2009 | Writ | Issued Writ. Certified copy of writ and order mailed to Hon. Robert H. Perry, District Judge, by this office. | 09-11257 | |
05/07/2009 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Hon. Robert H. Perry, District Judge, by mail from this office on this day. | 09-11257 | |
06/02/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-12791 | |
06/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |