Case Information: 53435 | |||
Short Caption: | PASCUA (BRIDGET) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41548 , 47557 , 49269 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172004 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/17/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-06854 | |
03/17/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/14/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-09407 | |
04/27/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Motions filed on April 3, 2009, denied. | 09-10321 | |
05/12/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-10546 | |
05/12/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/20/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2009. | 09-10546 |