judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEV. BD. OF PAROLE COMM'RS VS. MORROW

Case Information: 53436
Short Caption:NEV. BD. OF PAROLE COMM'RS VS. MORROWCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A542550Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/19/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/18/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/18/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 09-06901
04/01/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. (Cross-appeal)
04/01/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Cross-appeal filed by respondent Morrow in proper person.) (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 09-08200
04/01/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Parties are advised to notify this court immediately if a change of designation of parties is desired. 09-08201
04/06/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. 09-08523
04/06/2009Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. 09-08524
04/27/2009Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Appellant/Cross-Respondent -STRICKEN PER 08/12/09 ORDER-- 09-10389
05/26/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Opening Brief with Permission to File Expanded Brief of 37 Pages Pursuant to NRAP Rule 28. 09-13014
05/26/2009BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 09-13015
05/26/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Order to Show Cause why Respondents/Cross-Appellanst should not be Held in Contempt of Court. 09-13017
05/26/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Dismiss Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Appeal. 09-13019
05/26/2009BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 09-13041
06/03/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Richard David Morrow's Motion to Dismiss. 09-13744
06/12/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to Allow Appellant/Cross-Respondent to File Reply to Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Response to Pending Motion to Dismiss. 09-14745
06/12/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Reply to Respondents/Cross-Appellants Response to Pending Motion to Dismiss their Appeal. 09-14746
08/12/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Morrow is not an aggrieved party with standing to appeal. Accordingly, we dismiss Morrow's appeal. fn1-[We strike Morrow's transcript request form, filed on April 27, 2009.] We deny Morrow's motion to dismiss the Parole Board's appeal. fn2-[ We deny as moot Morrow's motion for leave to file a reply in support of his motion to dismiss, inasmuch as the reply was filed on June 12, 2009.] fn3-[ We direct the clerk of this court to modify the caption to conform to the disposition in this order.] The Parole Board shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve its opening brief and appendix. Morrow shall then have 30 days to file an answering brief. The Parole Board shall have 30 days from service of the answering brief to file a reply brief, if any. fn6-[ We deny Morrow's motion for an order to show cause why the Parole Board should not be held in contempt.] 09-19621
08/31/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Order for the Nevada Department of Corrections to Provide Respondent Access to a Typewriter/Word Processor to File Brief. 09-21211
10/02/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion and Modifying Briefing Schedule. Respondent's August 31, 2009, motion for an order requiring the Nevada Department of Corrections (NDOC) to provide respondent with a typewriter or word processor to prepare his answering brief in this appeal is denied. But in light of respondent's asserted medical condition, which has not been disputed by appellants, we modify the briefing schedule set forth in our August 12, 2009, order to permit respondent additional time to prepare his answering brief. Specifically, respondent shall have 60 days from service of appellants' opening brief to file and serve his answering brief. Appellants shall thereafter have 30 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve a reply brief, if any. 09-24175
10/23/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-25921
10/23/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 09-25922
12/16/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Shorten Time to Submit Answering Brief and Acceptance of Handwritten Brief. 09-30598
12/16/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to File Expanded Answering Brief of 47 Pages Pursuant to NRAP Rule 28. 09-30599
01/13/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (21) days. 10-01012
01/27/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions. We direct the clerk of this court to file the answering brief received on December 16, 2009. Reply Brief due: 30 days. 10-02230
01/27/2010BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Respondents Answering Brief. 09-30600
03/02/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. 10-05522
03/08/2010MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Its Reply Brief. 10-06006
04/02/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reply Brief due: April 5, 2010. 10-08640
04/07/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 10-09079
04/19/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 10-10102
04/19/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/26/2011Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "We reverse the clarification order of the district court in the Morrow appeal, Docket No. 53436, and we affirm the order of the district court in the Kamedula appeal, Docket No. 54173." Before Hardesty/Douglas/Pickering. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Pickering. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 21. Nos. 53436/54173. 11-15515
06/10/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing Pursuant to NRAP Rule 40. 11-17335
07/13/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). 11-21036
08/24/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 50262/52496, 54779, 55159, 49732, 51629, 53436/54173, 55228, 50668, 57649, 53518, 54165, 46623, and 53225/53340. (Letter entered in 50262 as document no. 11-26481.)
09/20/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC 11-28696
10/17/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-31913
10/17/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/26/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 24, 2011. 11-31913