Case Information: 53451 | |||
Short Caption: | LANDEROS (CONCEPCION) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C248505 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-07022 | |
03/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/19/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07025 | |
03/27/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/22/08 and 3/04/08. Court Reporter: Kiara Smidt/Angela Lee. Filed in district court on: 10/22/08 and 3/04/09. | 09-07815 | |
04/13/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/22/08. | 09-09243 | |
04/13/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Angela K. Lee stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/4/09. | 09-09247 | |
04/28/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-10554 | |
04/28/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-10558 | |
05/11/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-11657 | |
09/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-23076 | |
10/20/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-24028 | |
10/20/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/29/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 23, 2009. | 09-24028 |