Case Information: 53452 | |||
Short Caption: | MOJICA (MARIA) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51243 , 69015 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C226879 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-07029 | |
03/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/19/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 09-07031 | |
03/19/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07032 | |
03/27/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 09-07767 | |
03/27/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Revised Case Appeal Statement | 09-07788 | |
05/26/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionaly Imposing Sanctions. 15 days to pay $500 or 10 days to file proof of service of the rough draft tanscript, fast track statement or motion for extension. Counsel cautioned. | 09-12919 | |
06/01/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-13565 | |
06/01/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 02/09/09 and 02/18/09. Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. Filed in district court on: 03/26/09. | 09-13566 | |
06/01/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Request for Rough Draft Transcripts. | 09-13567 | |
06/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 10, 2009. | 09-13981 | |
06/10/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Request for Rough Draft Transcripts. | 09-14501 | |
07/10/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-17008 | |
07/10/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-17009 | |
07/29/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-18499 | |
07/30/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 09-18687 | |
12/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-29302 | |
12/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-30321 | |
12/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2010. | 09-30321 |