Case Information: 53450 | |||
Short Caption: | PAVON, JR. (EDWARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR072297 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-07013 | |
03/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/19/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07015 | |
03/23/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/1/08; 12/3/08; 1/23/09; and 3/4/09. Court Reporter: Sunshine Court Reporters. Not filed in the District Court. | 09-07262 | |
04/07/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stephanie Koetting stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/01/08, 12/03/08, 1/23/09, and 3/04/09. | 09-08689 | |
04/27/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-10326 | |
04/27/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-10329 | |
05/27/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Fast Track Response. Due date: 10 days. | 09-13175 | |
05/29/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-13351 | |
06/05/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Judgment of Conviction filed 12/3/08. Due Date: 10 days. | 09-14156 | |
06/11/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on | 09-14613 | |
06/11/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified Copy of Judgment filed in district court on 12/3/08. (submitted by Justin E. Oakes) | 09-14613 | |
06/12/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 12/03/08. | 09-14669 | |
09/25/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-23481 | |
10/20/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-24081 | |
10/20/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/27/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 21, 2009. | 09-24081 |