Case Information: 53449 | |||
Short Caption: | MATTHEWS, JR. VS. NEV. DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF0805008 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/22/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-06989 | |
03/23/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 09-07250 | |
04/10/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-09051 | |
06/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 09-14012 | |
06/22/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-15525 | |
06/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-03316 | |
02/11/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Motion to Correct the Record. | 10-03781 | |
04/09/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-09245 | |
05/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-09975 | |
05/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 10, 2010. | 10-09975 |