judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WAR VS. KRETUZER

Case Information: 53437
Short Caption:WAR VS. KRETUZERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A546938Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/20/2009 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/18/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Agwara & Associates check no. 5129.
03/18/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-06902
03/20/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Buchanan 09-07061
03/30/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/6/09 09-07924
04/08/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/30/09 09-08808
04/08/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-08816
04/08/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. 09-08817
05/12/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 09-11683
05/12/2009Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 09-11684
05/12/2009MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 09-11685
05/19/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH 09-12452
05/19/2009Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.