Case Information: 53438 | |||
Short Caption: | EAGLE MATERIALS, INC. VS. STIREN C/W 53808 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 53438*, 53808 | Related Case(s): | 53808 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI0018231 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/23/2009 / Yott, Laurie | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 11/09/2010 at 11:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 11/09/2010 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Littler Mendelson check no. 700707. | ||
03/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-06904 | |
03/23/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie A. Yott | 09-07216 | |
04/02/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-08347 | |
04/02/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 09-08348 | |
04/07/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Docketing Statement on settlement judge.) | 09-08715 | |
05/04/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/14/09 | 09-10954 | |
05/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. 53808 and 53438. These cases are appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 9/1/09 (or possibly earlier). | 09-13164 | |
05/29/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. 53808 and 53438. The settlement conference set for 9/1/09 has been rescheduled to 7/14/09. | 09-13404 | |
08/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. 53438/53808. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-20938 | |
09/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. Reinstate Briefing. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating the parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellants: 15 days for transcripts; 90 days for single opening brief and appendix. 53438/53808 | 09-21875 | |
09/25/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 53438/53808 (09-23446). | 09-23446 | |
12/08/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Nos. 53438/53808 (09-29725). | 09-29725 | |
12/08/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 53438/53808 (09-29730). | 09-29730 | |
12/30/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Nos. 53808/53438 (09-31534). | ||
12/30/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: February 8, 2010. Nos. 53808/53438 (09-31537). | ||
02/05/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Nos. 53438/53808. | 10-03358 | |
02/05/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols 1-3. Nos. 53438/53808. | 10-03361 | |
03/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 25, 2010. Nos. 53438/53808. | 10-06105 | |
03/25/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Nos. 53438/53808 (10-07848). | 10-07848 | |
09/27/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for November 9, 2010 at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City before the Northern Nevada Panel. Nos. 53438/53808. | 10-24700 | |
10/26/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 53438/53808. | 10-28003 | |
11/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Oral Argument Held this Day. Case Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel-MC/NS/MG | ||
02/03/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-03417 | |
02/28/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 53438/53808 | 11-05950 | |
02/28/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 53438/53808 | ||
03/03/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2011. Nos. 53438/53808 | 11-05950 |