Case Information: 53466 | |||
Short Caption: | SUTTON (KEVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34165 , 40477 , 47958 , 59378 , 63263 , 64244 , 65121 , 65652 , 67584 , 67905 , 71025 , 71025-COA , 73651 , 73651-COA , 74087 , 74087-COA , 75988 , 75988-COA , 77958 , 77958-COA , 79738 , 79738-COA , 80504 , 80504-COA , 82098 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139518 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Cherry, Douglas | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Parraguirre for Justice Douglas | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/01/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-07447 | |
03/24/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/24/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/24/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 09-08574 | |
04/13/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on April 2, 2009. | 09-09188 | |
06/01/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-3. | 09-13608 | |
06/01/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/12/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-RP/JH/KP fn1[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] | 10-00955 | |
03/09/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-06121 | |
04/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-06808 | |
04/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2010. | 10-06808 |