Case Information: 36313 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBINSON (LARRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C137947 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/15/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/20/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/20/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-10515 | |
08/04/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36313, 36332, 36336, 36338, 36343, 36374, 36396. | 00-13561 | |
11/15/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. | 00-20067 | |
11/15/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/22/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. On February 9, 2001, this court received a notice of withdrawal of appeal signed by appellant. We elect to construe this notice as a motion to voluntarily withdraw the appeal. The motion is granted, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-03351 | |
02/22/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |