judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SYLVANIA DIGGS V. SHANNON & LUCHS POLINGER (COLUMBIA PLAZA)

Case Information: 10-CV-1181
Short Caption:SYLVANIA DIGGS V. SHANNON & LUCHS POLINGER (COLUMBIA PLAZA)Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB8971-10Filed Date:09/15/2010

Opening Event Date:09/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/18/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSylvania Diggs YPro SeN
AppelleeShannon & Luchs Polinger (Columbia Plaza)N
Michael E. BrandNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/07/2010TMC - appellant's EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY
10/07/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY- of eviction
10/07/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED. It is ****MORE*****
10/07/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. (RZFINB) (jl)
10/27/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 7, 2010, directing appellant to submit to this court a file-stamped copy of the motion for appeal transcript filed in the Superior Court, within 10 calendar days from the date of the order, but it appearing that appellant has failed to comply wiht the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
10/27/2010DISMISSED
11/18/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived