judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HEIDI LOGAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 08-CM-1670
Short Caption:HEIDI LOGAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD10519-08Filed Date:08/04/2008

Opening Event Date:08/04/2008Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHeidi Logan Y
Kyle A. McGonigalYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Travis A. Hill NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/04/2008NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/30/2010 ORDERED that the parties shall, W/N 20 DAY from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed. See Molinaro v. NJ, 396 US 365 (1970). (BY: ETW)
10/15/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's).
10/25/2010 ORDERED that KYLE MCGONIGAL IS HEREBY APPOINTED, NPT, to September 22, 2010 to represent appellant in this appeal. It is ****MORE*****
10/25/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED, It is FURTHER ORDERED that COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, W/N 30 DAYS...FILE THE STATEMEN REGARDING TRANSCRIPT... (BY: ETW) lw
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (64pgs/Tape) 7/28/08 proc. w/CD
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/16/2010RECORD INDEX
12/16/2010RECORD COPIES
12/28/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/11/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/11/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
02/15/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/16/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief
05/12/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
05/12/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (RZTHPR)
06/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED