Case Information: 49661 | |||
Short Caption: | MOLER VS. SILVER QUEEN MOTEL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV17160 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/26/2007 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/19/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Peter L. Flangas--check no. 27606. | ||
06/19/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-13360 | |
06/26/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 07-13974 | |
07/12/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 07-15185 | |
07/16/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-15304 | |
09/18/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-20612 | |
09/20/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-20817 | |
09/27/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-21362 | |
10/15/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/09/07. To Court Reporter: 5th JDC Clerk. | 07-22700 | |
12/21/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 25, 2008. | 07-27716 | |
02/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Unopposed Motion for an Additional Extension of Time for Appellant to File Opening Brief. | 08-02678 | |
02/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Transcripts and Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: February 25, 2008. The District Court Clerk is not obligated to prepare the requested transcript of February 9, 2007. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Counsel admonished. | 08-03513 | |
02/27/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-04835 | |
02/27/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 08-04837 | |
03/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 28, 2008. | 08-07747 | |
04/28/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-10570 | |
04/28/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 08-10571 | |
06/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 30, 2008. | 08-14216 | |
07/01/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-16778 | |
09/18/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. Fn10 [. . . We have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] " SNP08-RP/MD/MC. | 08-24180 | |
10/14/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-24791 | |
10/14/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/22/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 16, 2008. | 08-24791 |