Case Heading (S-08-0001) | |||||
Case Number: | S-08-0001 | Case Docketed On: | 01/02/2008 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27) | ||
Short Title: | EUGENE M. LANGBERG v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION | ||||
Full Title: | EUGENE M. LANGBERG, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Eugene M. Langberg | Thomas L. Lee |
Appellee | Department of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation Division | Bruce A. Salzburg John William Renneisen James Clarence Demers James Michael Causey |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Workers' Compensation |
Opinion Number: | 2009 WY 39 |
Citation: | 203 P.3d 1098 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
01/02/2008 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
01/02/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
01/02/2008 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
01/02/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
02/08/2008 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
02/08/2008 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
02/08/2008 | Event - Phone Call - received call from Kristi Radosevich indicating that J.C. DeMers will be representing the state in this matter, and he has been given the docketing letter and caption. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
03/06/2008 | Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
03/07/2008 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
04/14/2008 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
05/30/2008 | Brief - Appellee and received copy of brief on disk | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
06/04/2008 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
06/18/2008 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
06/18/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/27/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (untimely) | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
06/30/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/30/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
03/18/2009 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
04/02/2009 | Motion - Fees and costs | Motion | Fees and costs | Final | |
04/02/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Approve and Certify Bill of Attorney | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/28/2009 | Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs | Order | Awarding attorney fees and costs | Final | |
04/28/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/28/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/28/2009 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/30/2009 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/29/09. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |