judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WESTERN ELITE VS. STATE, DEPT OF CONSERVATION

Case Information: 36307
Short Caption:WESTERN ELITE VS. STATE, DEPT OF CONSERVATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lincoln Co. - Seventh Judicial District - 36898LCClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/26/2000 / Christensen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/19/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Western Elite Inc.--check no. 002584. (Additional $100 due.)
06/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10436
06/19/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Additional $100 due. Due Date: 10 days
06/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Additional $100.00 from Lamond R. Mills & Associates LLC--check no. 1681.
11/15/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-20044
11/20/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-20319
11/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-20445
12/15/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-21939
01/02/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-00054
01/03/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 01-00102
01/03/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.