judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAYRAY (MILAGROS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53531
Short Caption:RAYRAY (MILAGROS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56980
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR081000Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/03/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 09-08402
04/03/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/03/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. 09-08404
04/10/2009Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 09-09004
05/15/2009Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 20, 2009. 09-12107
05/20/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-12561
05/27/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 19, 2009. 09-13188
06/19/2009Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 09-15336
06/19/2009AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 09-15337
07/10/2009Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: July 16, 2009. 09-17021
07/13/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-17157
07/14/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: August 17, 2009. 09-17332
08/12/2009Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 09-19606
01/08/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. 10-00584
02/02/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-02464
02/02/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/23/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 18, 2010. 10-02464